|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 785, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5430.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5908.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4099.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4004.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3395.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|