Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1262.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Liu. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1263.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 725.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|