|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5532.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 6125.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 3957.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3888.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
May 2 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3611.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3417.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|