Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4145.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3765.) (May 4). | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3643.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | April 6 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |