Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | Set for hearing August 11. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | August 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Set for hearing August 1. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4207.) (June 8). | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | Set for hearing June 8. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 4 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |