Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 12). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3332.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |