Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4148.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4004.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|