Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3766.) (May 3). | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3643.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |