Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
June 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4084.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4004.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16. (For testimony only).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3611.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|