Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
May 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3643.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3335.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|