|
07/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4654.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5402.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3336.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|