California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016