|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5489.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6233.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5963.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4047.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|