California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016