California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016