Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1196.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1147.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 434.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1702.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Set for hearing March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|