|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 728, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5909.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20 in ED. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|