California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1186 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 28, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016