Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 48. Page 6585.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (August 29). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
August 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5974.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3924.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3495.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|