|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5473.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 5437.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Set for hearing August 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 9. Page 6093.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5963.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4048.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3492.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|