LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1194
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1194
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1194
Compare Versions
SB1194 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1194 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1194 Amended April 21, 2016
SB1194 Amended April 11, 2016
SB1194 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1194 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1194 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1194 Amended April 21, 2016
SB1194 Amended April 11, 2016
SB1194 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare