Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3592.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |