Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |