|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 869, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5926.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 3847.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3616.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|