Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1145.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|