|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 675, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5431.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5910.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5505.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5505.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4048.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|