Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | April 18 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3592.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |