California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill June 8, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016