Senate | 11/30/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 3607.) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |