California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016