Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3592.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | April 11 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3492.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |