Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | April 18 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |