Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | April 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 20 in E.Q. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |