Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3643.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | April 6 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |