LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1249
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1249
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1249
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
04/20/2016
April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3607.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
04/08/2016
Set for hearing April 20.
Senate
03/03/2016
Referred to Coms. on ED. and B. & F.R.
Senate
02/19/2016
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
Senate
02/18/2016
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.