Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | April 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3497.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 12 in G.O. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R., G.O., and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |