Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | April 20 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Set for hearing April 18 in B.,P. & E.D. April 18 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |