Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |