California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1255 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 1, 2016
Bill May 5, 2016