Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3517.) (April 13). | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |