California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1260 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/11/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1260AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 11, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 29, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Allen FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to  amend Section 10565 of   add Section 13383.9 to  the Water Code, relating to stormwater. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1260, as amended, Allen.  Stormwater resource planning: project funding.   Stormwater: municipalities: online resource center.   Under existing law, the State Water Resources Control Board and the California regional water quality control boards issue municipal separate storm sewer system national pollutant discharge elimination system permits in accordance with the federal Clean Water Act. Existing law required the state board, no later than July 1, 2009, to develop a comprehensive guidance document for evaluating and measuring the effectiveness of municipal stormwater management programs and permits, as prescribed.   This bill would require the state board to establish an online resource center that addresses measures available for municipalities to comply with municipal stormwater permit requirements and would authorize the inclusion of certain information.   Existing law, the Stormwater Resources Planning Act, authorizes one or more public agencies to develop a stormwater resource plan. The act requires the State Water Resources Control Board, by July 1, 2016, to establish guidance for purposes of the act. The act requires, with certain exceptions, the development of a stormwater resource plan and compliance with the act to receive grants for stormwater and dry weather runoff capture projects from a bond act approved by the voters after January 1, 2014.   This bill, by March 1, 2017, would require the board to include as part of its guidance a list of potential funding sources available to a public agency to fund projects identified in a public agency's stormwater resource plan.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 13383.9 is added to the   Water Code   , to read:   13383.9. The state board shall establish an online resource center that addresses measures available for municipalities to comply with municipal stormwater permit requirements and may include the following information: (a) Links to the following: (1) Relevant state, federal, and local agencies regarding municipal separate storm sewer system national pollutant discharge elimination system permits. (2) Water quality mitigation measures for watershed management programs or enhanced watershed management programs. (3) Various regional agencies related to stormwater, including, but not limited to, public works departments and special districts. (b) A library of scientific studies relevant to stormwater issues confronting our communities.   SECTION 1.   Section 10565 of the Water Code is amended to read: 10565. (a) By July 1, 2016, the board shall establish guidance for this part that shall include, but is not limited to, the following: (1) Identifying types of local agencies and nongovernmental organizations that need to be consulted in developing a stormwater resource plan. (2) Defining appropriate quantitative methods for identifying and prioritizing opportunities for stormwater and dry weather runoff capture projects. (3) Defining the appropriate geographic scale of watersheds for stormwater resource planning. (4) Other guidance the board deems appropriate to achieve the objectives of this part. (b) By March 1, 2017, the board shall include as part of its guidance for this part a list of potential funding sources available to a public agency to fund projects identified in a public agency's stormwater resource plan.