California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1260 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016