|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 309, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 4. Page 6078.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3977.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3888.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|