Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |