Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3628.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|