Senate | 06/06/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | April 20 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing April 27. (Vote only). | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | April 20 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 3646.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | April 13 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |