06/27/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2016. | |||
06/27/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/20/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5403.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3463.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |