Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3522.) (April 12). | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |