Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3417.) (April 6). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |