|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5452.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5921.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4141.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4007.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12 in HUMAN S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|